Case: 06-12-00136-CR
06-12-00136-CR
08/14/2012
Capital Murder
Justin Ray Childs
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/18/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
01/15/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/2013 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
09/11/2013 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||||
07/24/2013 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | WRIT REFUSED | | ||||||
06/12/2013 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||||
06/06/2013 | Petition for discretionary review filed | | |||||||
05/02/2013 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
04/08/2013 | Submitted | | |||||||
03/20/2013 | Exhibits filed |
| |||||||
03/18/2013 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
03/18/2013 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
03/18/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
02/14/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
02/14/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
01/15/2013 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
01/15/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
01/15/2013 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
12/18/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
12/14/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
11/20/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
11/14/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
10/15/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
10/15/2012 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||||
09/21/2012 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |||||||
09/14/2012 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed | | |||||||
09/13/2012 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed | | |||||||
09/12/2012 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed | | |||||||
08/23/2012 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
08/14/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/11/2013 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
09/11/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jerry D. Rochelle Lauren N. Sutton |
Childs, Justin Ray | Appellant | Jeff Harrelson |
Trial Court Information
102nd District Court
Bowie
Honorable Bobby Lockhart
12F0310-102
Melanie C. Harris
Life TDCJ-ID without parole