judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEELE VS. TURNIPSEED

Case Information: 34787
Short Caption:STEELE VS. TURNIPSEEDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38848 , 49411
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9900270Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/03/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08457
09/08/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/17/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Documents from District Court Clerk. Certified Copy of Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Plaintiff). 99-09470
10/14/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/27/99. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson. 99-09951
10/14/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/30/99. Court Reporter: Cindy Lee Brown. 99-09952
10/25/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. 99-10451
11/03/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Mailed on 10/28/99. 99-10786
11/03/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/10/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Deputy A.G. Paul Taggart stating that the State Engineer should be included as a respondent in this appeal. 99-11110
12/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We direct the clerk to amend the caption on this court's docket so that it is consistent with the caption on this order, and to list the Attorney General on the docket as counsel for the additional respondent]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12470
01/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 00-00344
01/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/19/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 12, 2000. 00-00344