judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD L. SNELLING v. ANDY ROMAN, d/b/a ALPINE EXCAVATION

Case Heading (06-91)
Case Number:06-91Case Docketed On:04/26/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:RONALD L. SNELLING v. ANDY ROMAN, d/b/a ALPINE EXCAVATION
Full Title:RONALD L. SNELLING, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ANDY ROMAN, d/b/a ALPINE EXCAVATION, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald L. Snelling Pro Se
AppelleeAndy RomanVirgil G. Kinnaird
Sheryl Smith Bunting

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/26/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/26/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/26/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/06/2006Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppellantFinal
07/19/2006Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
07/26/2006Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/26/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/31/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/01/2006Record - Transmitted record on appeal; three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/01/2006Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
03/20/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal