judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF ISAAC H. DUPREE; CURTIS CARLOS DUPREE, APLT

Case Information: 10-PR-0993
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF ISAAC H. DUPREE; CURTIS CARLOS DUPREE, APLTClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM46-09Filed Date:04/30/2010

Opening Event Date:04/30/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/16/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis Carlos Dupree NPro SeN
AppelleeEdna Elizabeth Dupree N
William E. Seals NN
AppelleeEstate of Isaac Henry DupreeN
William E. Seals NN
AppelleeVictoria A. Ward NPro SeN
AppelleeIsaac Henry Dupree NPro SeN
AppelleeDavid Dupree NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
04/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL (RECEIVED ONLY) (Appellant's IFP motion in the trial court denied on 5/14/10. Appellant has not paid the cost nor attached an IFP motion for D.C.C.A. consideration)
09/15/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on April 30, 2010, and it appearing that appellant's motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis was denied by the trial court, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order tender the $100 filing fee, or file a fully completed motion and financial information statement, to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order shall result in this appeal being dismissed without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
10/25/2010 On consideration of this court's order of September 15, 2010, directing appellant to tender the $100 fee or file a fully completed motion and financial information statement to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis, within 10 calendar days from the date of the order, and it appearing that this court's order was returned as undeliverable, and it further appearing that appellant has moved and has not provided this court with his current mailing address, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
10/25/2010DISMISSED
11/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/18/2014FiledArchived