Case: 05-15-01105-CV
05-15-01105-CV
09/14/2015
Miscellaneous/other civil
Millennium Ice, Inc. and Oleksandr Vladimir Matorin aka Alexsandr Matorin
Cryousa LLC, Cryousa Mobile, LLC, Millennium Ice Partners, LLC, Eric Rauscher individually and Peter Belesky individually
No
8th Court of Appeals
10/05/2015
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/14/2015 | Record due | | |||||
10/02/2015 | Case stored | | |||||
10/02/2015 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
09/28/2015 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/28/2015 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
09/25/2015 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/25/2015 | Fee paid |
| |||||
09/25/2015 | Corrected document requested |
| |||||
09/23/2015 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||
09/23/2015 | Additional copies of documents received after initial filing |
| |||||
09/15/2015 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
09/15/2015 | Fee requested |
| |||||
09/15/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/14/2015 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
09/14/2015 | Fee requested |
| |||||
09/14/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/11/2015 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
07/15/2015 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
06/16/2015 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/02/2015 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Millennium Ice, Inc., et al. | Appellant | Kristin A. Regel |
CRYOUSA, LLC, et al. | Appellee | William David Dunn |
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tonya Parker
DC-13-08491
Renee Carroll