Case: 07-12-00175-CR
07-12-00175-CR
05/09/2012
Poss of a Controlled Substance
Alana Danielle Bynog
The State of Texas
No
2nd Court of Appeals
05/07/2012
02-12-00170-CR
7th Court of Appeals
05/09/2012
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/16/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
08/08/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/26/2013 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
11/01/2013 | Case returned from higher court | | |||||||
09/18/2013 | Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals | Refused | | ||||||
08/14/2013 | Case forwarded to higher court | | |||||||
08/02/2013 | Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals | | |||||||
07/10/2013 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
02/22/2013 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/01/2013 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||||
08/16/2012 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
08/16/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||||
08/10/2012 | Email received | | |||||||
08/08/2012 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||||
07/20/2012 | Reporters record filed | | |||||||
07/02/2012 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
05/09/2012 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||||
05/07/2012 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANT | | ||||||
04/26/2012 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
04/23/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
04/10/2012 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
04/10/2012 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
03/28/2012 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/01/2039 | Retention | Date criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate) |
11/26/2013 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Lori J. Kaspar |
Bynog, Alana Danielle | Criminal - Appellant | Andrew Ottaway |
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
CR11975
Ct. 1 16 years TDCJ $8,000.00 Fine