Case: 07-86-00248-CV
07-86-00248-CV
10/06/1986
Miscellaneous civil
City of Lubbock, Tx & Civil Service Commission of Lubbock,Tx
Knox, Bill
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/11/1988 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/22/1988 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
10/15/1987 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
10/13/1987 | Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc. | | |
09/14/1987 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Overruled | |
09/01/1987 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
08/18/1987 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
05/18/1987 | Submitted | | |
05/18/1987 | Submission | | |
11/26/1986 | Brief Filed | | |
11/26/1986 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/05/1986 | Brief Filed | | |
10/06/1986 | Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed | | |
10/06/1986 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
04/11/1988 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William Shaver
86-513,251