judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

James, David Randall v. Valderas, Hon. Harold, Judge, 233rd District Court

Case: 02-86-00221-CV
02-86-00221-CV
10/10/1986
Mandamus
James, David Randall
Valderas, Hon. Harold, Judge, 233rd District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
11/10/1986Case stored
10/23/1986Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/20/1986Response Filed
10/14/1986Order Entered
10/10/1986Motion to File
10/10/1986Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/10/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
233-31719