Case: 04-18-00848-CR
04-18-00848-CR
11/09/2018
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Eusebio Castillo, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/2019 | Waiver of remaining time to file brief | State |
| ||
04/01/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/15/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
07/09/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
07/03/2019 | Order issued | Abated |
| ||||
07/03/2019 | Motion to withdraw appeal disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
07/03/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
06/24/2019 | Letter filed |
| |||||
06/24/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
05/30/2019 | Motion filed |
| |||||
05/30/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
05/30/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
05/16/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
04/29/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
04/22/2019 | Internal memo | | |||||
04/09/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
04/03/2019 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
04/03/2019 | Waiver of remaining time to file brief |
| |||||
04/01/2019 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed | | |||||
04/01/2019 | Letter filed | | |||||
04/01/2019 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
03/06/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion | | ||||
03/06/2019 | Order entered |
| |||||
03/01/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/30/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
01/30/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
12/31/2018 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
12/14/2018 | Prescreened | | |||||
12/10/2018 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
11/16/2018 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
11/08/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
11/08/2018 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
10/29/2018 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
10/23/2018 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/03/2019 | Status | Appeal abated |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Joe D. Gonzales |
Castillo , TDCJ# 02228447, Eusebio | Appellant | Eusebio Castillo TDCJ# 02228447 Angela J. Moore |
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Stephanie R. Boyd
2017CR5376A
Yvonne O'Bar
Life