judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Rex Peterson v. La Costa Villas, L.L.C. et al

Case: 05-13-00975-CV
05-13-00975-CV
07/17/2013
Personal Injury
Rex Peterson
La Costa Villas, L.L.C. et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
04/25/2014Post submission brief filedAppellant
11/21/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/22/2013Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/23/2015Mandate issued
01/21/2015Order enteredOtherwise Disposed
11/21/2014Petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Denied
09/29/2014Petition for review filed in Supreme Court
08/28/2014Motion for extension of time to file petition for review disposed by Supreme CourtMotion or Writ Granted
08/27/2014Sent to publisher
07/15/2014Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/15/2014Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/25/2014Post submission brief filed
04/24/2014Submitted
04/22/2014Motion to add additional attorney of record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/21/2014Motion to add additional attorney of record filed
04/21/2014Notice filed
04/17/2014Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
04/15/2014Confirmation of oral argument & counsel presenting oral argument
03/12/2014Set for submission on oral argument
11/21/2013Case ready to be set
11/21/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested
11/21/2013Appellees brief due
10/22/2013Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/22/2013Appellants brief due
09/20/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/19/2013Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/28/2013Record due
08/23/2013Electronic Clerks Record Filed
08/13/2013Letter received
07/24/2013Notice filed
07/23/2013Docketing statement filed
07/17/2013Docketing statement due
07/17/2013Fee requested
07/17/2013Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
07/11/2013Notice of appeal filed in trial court
04/30/2013Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2015Case StoredCase stored
07/15/2020RetentionDate civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
La Costa Villas, L.L.C., et alAppelleeDaniel Buechler  
Cassie Dallas  
Michael A. Yanof
Peterson, RexAppellantEric H. Marye
Matthew J. Kita
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable King Fifer
CC-11-07234-B
Lanetta J. Williams