judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

G. M. POTTER, ET AL. v. SUN OIL COMPANY, ET AL.

Case: A-372
A-372
11/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
G. M. POTTER, ET AL.
SUN OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/02/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/11/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
07/12/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/26/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/12/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/14/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
11/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/02/1945Motion for Rehearing
10/01/1945Response to Motion filed
09/11/1945Brief in Support of Petition
07/12/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/26/1945Supplemental Brief filed
05/15/1945Bond
01/12/1945Motion for RehearingFiling granted
12/14/1944Response to Petition
11/27/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/18/1944Document received (See Remarks)
11/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
G. M. Potter, et al.Petitioner
Sun Oil Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information