judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT and DAVID JAMISON, an individual v. PARK COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Case Heading (06-85)
Case Number:06-85Case Docketed On:04/19/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT and DAVID JAMISON, an individual v. PARK COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Full Title:NORTHFORK CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBLE DEVELOPMENT and DAVID JAMISON, an individual, Appellants (Petitioners), v. PARK COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantNorthfork Citizens for Responsible DevelopmentDebra J. Wendtland
Anthony Todd Wendtland
AppellantDavid JamisonDebra J. Wendtland
Anthony Todd Wendtland
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Park County, WyomingBryan A. Skoric
James F. Davis

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/19/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/19/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/19/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/19/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/19/2006Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
04/21/2006Response/Objection - Motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
05/01/2006Notice-Incoming - Additional authority by appelleeNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
05/01/2006Response/Objection - Reply to appellant's response to motion to dismissResponse/ObjectionReplyFinal
05/03/2006Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
05/19/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal