judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

J. ANTHONY CAPOZZOLI V. M. CRUZ

Case Information: 10-SP-0940
Short Caption:J. ANTHONY CAPOZZOLI V. M. CRUZClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Denial - Writ Of Habeas Corpus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CNC1011-09Filed Date:07/20/2010

Opening Event Date:07/20/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/15/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJ. Anthony Capozzoli YPro SeN
AppelleeM. Cruz NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/23/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed as having been UNTIMELY FILED. See DC App. R. 4(b). (BY: ETW)
08/23/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
09/13/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Appellant's).
09/23/2010 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY. See DC App. R. 4. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent that appellant is seeking MANDAMUS RELIEF, the requested relief IS DENIED. (FITHNW) (rm)
09/23/2010DISMISSED
10/15/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived