judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

NEWTON VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 31744
Short Caption:NEWTON VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C071110Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/24/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/29/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
03/12/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. Nos. 31485, 31744, 31792, 31829, 31830, 31848, 31856, 31864.
06/24/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
06/24/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/25/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Order to Respond. It does not appear from this court's review of the record that appellant was informed that he was not eligible for probation pursuant to former NRS 176.185. The state shall have 45 days from the date of this order to file points and authorities, specifically discussing: (Please see order (1) and (2)).
04/11/2000Other Other. Filed Answer to Order to Respond.
12/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. fn3[On February 25, 2000, this court ordered the State to provide a response. On April 11, 2000, the State filed a response in this court. On July 7, 2000, this court received a proper person reply to the State's answer. We have considered these documents in the resolution of this appeal.] We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-21035
01/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00302
01/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00302