judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAYNAYE HANEY and DUANE HANEY, husband and wife v. STEVE D. CRIBBS, personally, and DRM, INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (06-69)
Case Number:06-69Case Docketed On:03/27/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Certified Question - State District Court
Short Title:RAYNAYE HANEY and DUANE HANEY, husband and wife v. STEVE D. CRIBBS, personally, and DRM, INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:RAYNAYE HANEY and DUANE HANEY, husband and wife, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. STEVE D. CRIBBS, personally, and DRM, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRaynaye HaneyJeremy D. Michaels
Heather Noble
AppellantDuane HaneyJeremy D. Michaels
Heather Noble
AppelleeSteve D. CribbsPatrick J. Murphy
AppelleeDRM, Inc.Patrick J. Murphy

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/27/2006Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order certifying question Rule 11. Amended order.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder certifying question Rule 11Final
03/27/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/04/2006Order - Certified Question - Accepting questions/briefingOrderCertified Question - Accepting questions/briefingFinal
05/19/2006Brief - Appellants'BriefAppellantFinal
06/19/2006Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/05/2006Brief - Appellant reply (Wyo. R. App. P. 11.06 does not provide for filing reply briefs in answering certified questions.)BriefAppellant replyFinal
07/06/2006Motion - Strike appellants' reply brief.MotionStrikeFinal
07/06/2006Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/18/2006Order - Consolidating cases for purposes of preparing an opinion. Case 06-69 is consolidated with 05-279.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/27/2006Order - Denying motion to strike appellants' reply brief.OrderDenyFinal
12/20/2006Opinion - Opinion and journal order answering certified question. Question No. 1 answered in the affirmative. Unnecessary to answer the second certified question. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/05/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal