judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE J. BAKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0981
Short Caption:ANDRE J. BAKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-7674-09Filed Date:08/06/2010

Opening Event Date:08/06/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/16/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/09/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre J. Baker YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Angela G. Schmidt YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/06/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Lisa D. Chanel, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/18/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Lisa D. Chanel, Esquire
09/17/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ORDERED/NEEDED (pii))
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (354 pgs/Coney) 5/11-12/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (64 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/13/10 proc.
11/09/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (20 pgs/tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/cd
11/16/2010RECORD INDEX
11/16/2010RECORD COPIES
11/16/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (SEALED pleadings)
11/16/2010RECORD COMPLETED
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/30/2010APPENDIX attached to the brief of appellant
12/15/2010ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 10-CF-981 and 10-CO-1508 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Lisa D. Chanel, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1508 herein. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal no. 10-CO-1508 to this court forthwith. F/O thatthe supplemental brief of appellant addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 10-CO-1508 shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the consolidated brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
01/25/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to suspend briefing schedule and extend time to file motion to dimiss 10CO1508 (no oppo)
02/24/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION - for extension of time within which to file motion to dismiss appeal on behalf of aplt
03/10/2011ORDERED that appellant's motions are granted and appellant shall file a motion to dismiss appeal no. 10-CO-1508 on or before April 4, 2011. (JAC)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL case 10-CO-1508 (only) waiver attached
04/26/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that appeal nos. 10-CF-981 & 10-CO-1508 are hereby severed. F/O that the motion is granted and appeal no. 10-CO-1508 is hereby dismissed. See Johnson v. United States, 513 A.2d 798 (D.C. 1986). F/O that, in appeal no. 10-CF-981, the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW)
05/19/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 28m 2011 (no oppo)
05/27/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 28, 2011. (JAC)
06/28/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD no oppo
06/28/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
06/28/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
07/18/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
07/21/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting MOET to 8/18/11 (Appellant's Reply Brief)
07/28/2011FiledOrder Granting Appellee's motion to supplement the record
07/28/2011FiledSupplemental Record #5 (Attachments A - C, all contained in appellee's brief)
08/18/2011FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/06/2011FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/09/2012FiledArgued Before Washington,Fisher,Kravitz Lisa D.Chanel Esq.,for appellant Angela G.Schmidt Esq.,for appellee
03/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Fisher, Associate Judge, and Kravitz*, Associate Judge, Superior Court of the Distric of Columbia.)
04/10/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
04/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File request for a rehearing on behalf of appellant Other (Appellant)Granted
04/12/2012FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 5/28/12.
06/07/2012FiledMandate