Case: 08-11-00167-CR
08-11-00167-CR
05/10/2011
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Nathaniel Ray Smith
The State of Texas
No
2nd Court of Appeals
05/10/2011
02-11-00131-CR
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/10/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | State | |
10/11/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/22/2014 | Case stored | | |||||
06/25/2013 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
11/13/2012 | Letter filed | | |||||
10/31/2012 | Opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||
06/28/2012 | Submitted | | |||||
03/02/2012 | Set for submission on briefs | | |||||
11/10/2011 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
11/10/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | | |||||
10/11/2011 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | | |||||
08/08/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/08/2011 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |||||
07/25/2011 | Reporters record filed | | |||||
07/25/2011 | Jury lists and/or questionnaires filed | | |||||
07/25/2011 | Clerks record filed | | |||||
07/22/2011 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||
07/21/2011 | Reporters record received not filed | | |||||
05/23/2011 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
05/10/2011 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||||
04/13/2011 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/25/2013 | Retention | Criminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Hon. Robert Christian |
Smith, Nathaniel Ray | Criminal - Appellant | Hon. Cole J. Bryan |
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Ralph H. Walton
CR11587
45 yrs IDTDCJ, concurrently & $5,000 fine