judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Jason Auvenshine v. The State of Texas

Case: 13-18-00360-CR
13-18-00360-CR
06/29/2018
Intoxication Manslaughter
Jason Auvenshine
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
07/31/2019Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/17/2019Brief received - oral argument not requestedAppellant
07/17/2019Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/09/2020Mandate acknowledged by trial court clerk
01/07/2020Retention time case file will be retained
01/07/2020Mandate issued
10/10/2019Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
08/29/2019Submitted
08/23/2019Set for submission on briefs
08/01/2019Motion for leave disposedGrant motion
07/31/2019Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/23/2019Motion for leave filed
07/18/2019Letter filed
07/17/2019Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/17/2019Case ready to be set
07/17/2019Brief received - oral argument not requested
07/08/2019Notice of late brief
06/13/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
06/07/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/31/2019Notice of late brief
05/23/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGrant motion
05/16/2019Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/16/2019Case reinstated
04/15/2019Supplemental clerks record filed
04/04/2019Letter issued by the court
03/20/2019Supplemental reporters record filed
03/14/2019Letter issued by the court
02/07/2019Order issuedAbated
01/22/2019Notice of late brief
12/17/2018Exhibits filed
12/17/2018Reporters record filed
12/17/2018Corrected document requested
11/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGrant motion
11/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed
11/08/2018Supplemental clerks record filed
10/16/2018Case reinstated
10/15/2018Supplemental clerks record filed
09/28/2018Letter issued by the court
09/28/2018Letter filed
09/26/2018Letter issued by the court
08/14/2018Order issuedAbated
07/19/2018No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record
07/19/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed
07/19/2018No reporters record filed in criminal case
07/13/2018Clerks record filed
06/29/2018Trial court certification filed
06/29/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
05/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/16/2018Sentence imposed in the trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/07/2020Case StoredCase stored
01/07/2020RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasHon. Douglas K. Norman
Hon. Mark A. Gonzalez
Auvenshine, JasonCriminal - AppellantHon. Christopher A. Dorsey
Trial Court Information
214th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Inna Klein
17FC-1261F
Valerie J. Saenz
Ct 1 & 2 Life TDCJ