Case Information: 90-BG-0914 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DAVID L. HERNDON | Classification: | Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 07/13/1990 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 07/13/1990 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | 10/17/1990 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 01/24/1991 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Petitioner | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Respondent | David L. Herndon | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HERNDON, DAVID L. IN THE MATTER OF: | |||
01/01/1905 | TRDATE- 91/01/24 ACTION - MEMO ATTY 1 - FRISCHM FOR - PETITIONER ATTY 2 - HERNDOND FOR - pro se | |||
07/13/1990 | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. BDN9-88 (BPR RECOMMENDS DISBARMENT) CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
07/25/1990 | LETTER FROM ASST BAR COUNSEL ADVISING THAT BAR COUNSEL SUPPORTS THE REPT & REC OF THE BPR. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
08/06/1990 | RESPONDENT'S EXCEPTIONS CWC PANEL SCDATE 080290 SCHPRD RSE | |||
08/10/1990 | ORDER BRIEF OF RESPONDENT DUE IN 40 DAYS; BAR COUNSEL'S BRF DUE 30 DAYS THEREAFTER. CWC PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/20/1990 | RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/17/1990 | PETITIONER'S BRIEF (BAR COUNSEL). DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
11/05/1990 | REPLY BRIEF OF RESPONDENT. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/24/1991 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/24/1991 | MEMORANDUM ARGUED BEFORE JJ BE/ST/FA PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/11/1991 | DISBARMENT OPINION DISBARRING RESP FROM PRACTICE OF LAW IN DC EFFECT. 30 DAYS FROM DATE OF OPIN. DAS PANELSTFABE SCDATE 012491 SCHPRD RDEC | |||
09/11/1991 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - DBAR METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 596 A.2d 592 | |||
09/11/1991 | OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 2569 | |||
09/25/1991 | RESP MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PET FOR REHEARING DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/04/1991 | ORDER GRANT MO OF RESP TO EXT TM TO FL A PET FOR REHEARING IN 20 DAYS. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
10/24/1991 | PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC OF RESPONDENT. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/23/1991 | ORDER DENY PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC. DAS PANELEB SCDATE 110691 SCHPRD VS |