judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BENOIT BROOKENS, ET AL V. D.C. RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSION

Case Information: 11-AA-0542
Short Caption:BENOIT BROOKENS, ET AL V. D.C. RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Other agency
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:RHTP11552-08Filed Date:05/03/2011

Opening Event Date:05/03/2011Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/27/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBenoit Brookens N
B. Marian ChouNY
PetitionerGene Crotzer N
B. Marian ChouNY
PetitionerEleanor Johnson N
B. Marian ChouNY
RespondentD.C. Rental Housing CommissionN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/03/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
05/03/2011FILING FEE of $100.00.
05/05/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, OAH and Todd Kim, Esq.
05/13/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE- and to dismiss petiton for lack of jurisdiction
05/16/2011TMC - motion to intervene & to dismiss
05/27/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
06/23/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION TO INTERVENE IS DENIED AS MOOT and the caption is amended above to reflect the appropriate respondents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED and the PFR IS DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. The appeal in this case should have been filed w/the DC Rental Housing Commission... (BRNBKG)
06/23/2011DISMISSED
07/07/2011PETITIONER'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
08/18/2011FiledMotion to Withdraw Petition for Rehearing En Banc (Petitioner's)
09/02/2011FiledGranted the motion of appellant, Dorchester Tenants, to withdraw the petition for rehearing en banc and the petition is hereby withdrawn.
09/27/2011FiledMandate