judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LALONDE (FRED) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35000
Short Caption:LALONDE (FRED) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 59921
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR3104Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10257
11/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11481
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12556
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 1999. 99-12556