judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT R. KNIGHT v. TCB CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN, LLC and CATHERINE PETERSEN, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF ERIC S. TURNER

Case Heading (S-10-0173)
Case Number:S-10-0173Case Docketed On:08/09/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:SCOTT R. KNIGHT v. TCB CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN, LLC and CATHERINE PETERSEN, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF ERIC S. TURNER
Full Title:SCOTT R. KNIGHT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. TCB CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN, LLC and CATHERINE PETERSEN, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE ESTATE OF ERIC S. TURNER, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott R. KnightJason M. Tangeman
AppelleeTCB CONSTRUCTION AND DESIGN, LLCAllen Gardzelewski
Megan L. Hayes
AppelleeCatherine PetersonAllen Gardzelewski
Megan L. Hayes

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2011 WY 27
Citation:248 P.3d 178

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/09/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/09/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/27/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/21/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
10/21/2010Notice-Incoming - Request to place on expedited docketNotice-IncomingRequest to place on brief only docketFinal
10/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees and Notice of Request for Expedite ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/08/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
11/08/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
11/08/2010Response/Objection - OtherResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
11/09/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief and Objection to Request for Expedite ReviewEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Megan Hayes for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript & Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jason Tangeman for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/08/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Jason M. Tangeman for appellant; Megan L. Hayes for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
12/08/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/18/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/08/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/08/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/10/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/9/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal