judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION INSURANCE TRUST V. AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, ET AL

Case Information: 11-CV-0566
Short Caption:AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION INSURANCE TRUST V. AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB8801-08Filed Date:05/04/2011

Opening Event Date:05/04/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/18/2012
Argued/Submitted:09/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/07/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeAmerican Psychological Ass'n Insurance TrustN
Francis A. Vasquez YN
Dana E. Foster NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantAmerican Psychological AssociationN
Barbara S. WahlYY
Deanne Ottaviano NN
Appellee-Cross-AppellantAlan E. Kazdin N
Deanne Ottaviano NN
Barbara S. WahlNY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantBarry S. Anton N
Deanne Ottaviano NN
Barbara S. WahlNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/04/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/18/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on May 4, 2011, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non- appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3) (A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
05/23/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 3/20/09, 3/2/10, 7/14/10 & 9/23/10) (elp)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (4-pgs/tape 3/20/09 proc.)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (44-pgs/tape 3/2/10 proc.)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (80-pgs/tape 7/14/10 proc.)
06/01/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4(52-pgs/tape 9/23/10 proc.)w/cd
06/01/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/06/2011RECORD INDEX (FOR ALL APPEALS) 11-CV-566, 11-CV-626 & 11-CV-627 (elp)
06/15/2011 Upon consideration of the notice of appeal in these matters, and it appearing that the transcripts needed for appeals nos. 11-CV-626 and 11-CV-627, have been previously filed in appeal no. 11-CV-566, and it further appearing that the complete records on appeals have been filed with this court, it is ORDERED sua sponte, that appeals nos. 11-CV-566, 11-CV-626 and 11-CV-627 are consolidated for purposes herein. It is (MORE)
06/15/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, including opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/ cross-appellee; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, including response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (JAC) elp
07/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND- (American Psychological Association's & Dr. Barry Aton's motion for limited remand or for leave for the superior court to make clerical corrections cross aple
07/11/2011Filed***SEALED****Motion To Stay Lower Court/Agency Order (Appellant-Cross-Appellee) (American Psychological Assoc. Insurance Trust)
07/12/2011FiledTMC- MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT; OPPO; REPLY; MTIONS TO SEAL APPEALLANT'S MOTION TO STAY-OPPO-MOTION FOR LIMITED REMAND-OPPO-MOTION TO FILE (LODGED) REPLY; MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING-APPELLANT'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
07/13/2011FiledOpposition to Motion for Limited Remand or for leave for the Superior Court to make clerical corrections (American Psychological Association Insurance Trust) (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
07/14/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Limited Remand, to July 22, 2011 (no oppo). (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Anton)Granted
07/14/2011FiledMotion - to place under seal the aplt's motion for temporary stay of judgement pending the appeals of Superior Court's April 18, 2011 final orders (See 7/12/11 DOCKET ENTRY) (FILED BY: American Psychological Association) (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
07/18/2011FiledMotion To Seal -opposition to aplt's motion for stay of judgment pending appeal of Superior Court's April 18, 2011 final orders (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)
07/18/2011Filed***SEALED****aple's opposition to aplt's motion for stay of judgment pending appeal of Superior Court's April 18, 2011 final orders (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association) (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)
07/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
07/26/2011FiledReply (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
08/04/2011FiledOrder Granting CONSENT MOTIONS FOR SEAL...AND CLERK WILL SEAL THE MOTION TO STAY AND OPPOSITION
08/04/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave AND THE CLERK WILL FILE THE LODGED REPLY TO THE OPPOSITION TO THE MOTION FOR LIMITED REMAND
08/04/2011FiledReply to aplt/aple oppo to motion for limited remand or for leave for the Sup Crt to make clerical corrections. (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Anton)
08/04/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR LIMITED REMAND AND THE RECORD IS REMANDED TO SUPERIOR COURT...MOTION TO STAY IS HELD IN ABEYANCE PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF COURT...
08/04/2011FiledTMC/ MOTION TO STAY JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL OPPO 8/4/11 ORDER HOLDING MOTION TO STAY IN ABEYANCE NOTICES OF COMPLIANCE
08/25/2011FiledNotice Received - compliance with court order dtd 8/4/11. (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
09/22/2011FiledNotice Received - compliance with court order 8/4/11 (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledOrder Denying APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY and VACATING THE ADMINISTRATIVE STAY ENTERED AUGUST 4, 2011...
10/04/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/08/2011FiledStipulation To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant-Cross-Appellee American Psychological Ass'n Insurance Trust, Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)
11/14/2011FiledMotion for order placing under seal aplt's cross aple American Psychological Association Insurance Trust's brief and appendix (Appellant-Cross-Appellee American Psychological Ass'n Insurance Trust, Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)Granted
11/15/2011FiledTMC/MOTION TO FILE BRIEF & APPENDIX UNDER SEAL//STIPULATION TO DISMISS
12/13/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)Granted
12/13/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)Granted
12/14/2011FiledORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS and APPEALS NOS 11-CV-626 & 11-CV-627 ARE DISMISSED and GRANTING MOTION TO FILE BRIEF and JOINT APPENDIX UNDER SEAL and the ANY REPLY BRIEF UNDER SEAL and GRANTING APA's MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO LATER THAN JANUARY 18, 2012
12/14/2011FiledBrief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee American Psychological Ass'n Insurance Trust, Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association) ********************SEALED
12/14/2011FiledAppendix Vol I thru III (Appellant-Cross-Appellee American Psychological Ass'n Insurance Trust, Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association) **********************SEALED
01/18/2012FiledBrief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)
01/18/2012FiledAppendix (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)
01/18/2012FiledBriefing Completed
02/10/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/27/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
04/05/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
07/20/2012FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Anton, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Kazdin)
07/26/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/19/2012FiledArgued Before Judges Oberly,Beckwith,Mcleese Francis A.Vasquez Esq.,for appellant. Barbara S. Wahl Esq.,for appellee,
12/28/2012FiledChange Of Address Received From (Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association)
07/03/2013FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal (Appellant-Cross-Appellee American Psychological Ass'n Insurance Trust, Appellee-Cross-Appellant American Psychological Association, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Anton, Appellee-Cross-Appellant Kazdin)Granted
07/12/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal.
07/12/2013FiledDismissed
08/07/2013FiledMandate