judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MILTON (GREGORY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34999
Short Caption:MILTON (GREGORY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR92P1026Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/02/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-10256
10/28/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 8/30/99. To Court Reporter: Rebecca Martinelli. 99-10559
10/28/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-10560
11/16/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 30, 1999. Court Reporter: Rebecca S. Martinelli. 99-11371
02/17/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 2/16/00. 00-02541
03/21/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 20, 2000. 00-04489
04/19/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 4/13/00. 00-06249
05/02/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/2/00 (Reno/Carson). 00-07110
05/02/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that counsel's failure to challenge these instructions did not prejudice Milton because the instructions wre not erroneous. "We therefore affirm the district court's order." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 00-21579
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21792
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 12, 2001. 00-21792