judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GARY DALE MARQUESS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0172)
Case Number:S-10-0172Case Docketed On:08/05/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:GARY DALE MARQUESS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GARY DALE MARQUESS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGary Dale MarquessDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jessica Y. Frint
Stewart Michael Young

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 95
Citation:256 P.3d 506

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/16/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/06/2010Notice-Incoming - Other - received copy of amended notice of appeal filed in district court.Notice-IncomingOtherFinal
11/08/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/23/2010Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - for Jessica Y. Frint, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
12/23/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellee with copy of designation of record on appeal; and consent and approval.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/18/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jessica Frint, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/20/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/20/2011Event - Phone Call - Called Cheryl at the District Court Clerk's office and reminded her that the original papers volumes were to be no more than 250 pages.EventPhone CallFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk A. Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General, Stewart M. Young, Director, PAP, and Jessica Y. Frint, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Frint for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/17/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/08/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal