judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

B.F. SAUL COMPANY V. WENDY TIEFENBACHER

Case Information: 11-CV-0565
Short Caption:B.F. SAUL COMPANY V. WENDY TIEFENBACHERClassification:Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:LTB20902-06Filed Date:05/03/2011

Opening Event Date:05/03/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/01/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/14/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantB.F. Saul CompanyN
Joshua M. GreenbergNY
AppelleeWendy TiefenbacherNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/03/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/14/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL W/N 20 DAYS SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-APPEALABLE ORDER... (BY: ETW)
06/14/2011FiledTMC - OTSC-ROTSC
07/01/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
07/08/2011RECEIVED- aplt's brief in response to show cause order
07/27/2011FiledSupplemental Record#1 (21-pgs/tape 4/4/11 proc.)w/cd
08/01/2011FiledRecord Index
08/01/2011FiledRecord Completed
09/22/2011FiledDismissed (Opinion) Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Newman, Senior Judge.) (ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed for lack of jurisdiction.)
10/14/2011FiledMandate