judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JERGIS VS. SEARS ROEBUCK

Case Information: 36510
Short Caption:JERGIS VS. SEARS ROEBUCKCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389161Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Richard Jergis--Bank of America Cashier's Check No. 000088732.
08/03/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-13411
08/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Sears, Roebuck & Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-14617
11/15/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We grant respondent's motion and "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[As we dismiss this appeal on this basis, we do not consider the other arguments raised by respondent.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-20032
12/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-20143
12/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 28, 2000. 00-20143