judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHINENYE O. NJOKU V. DC DEP'T CONS. REG. AFFAIRS

Case Information: 11-AA-0546
Short Caption:CHINENYE O. NJOKU V. DC DEP'T CONS. REG. AFFAIRSClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - OAH - Regulatory Affairs
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DCRAV700447-11Filed Date:05/05/2011

Opening Event Date:05/05/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/17/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/12/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerChinenye O. Njoku NPro SeN
RespondentD.C. Department of Consumer and Regulatory AffairsN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/05/2011PETITION FOR REVIEW
05/05/2011FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
05/10/2011CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD and Todd S. Kim (OAG)
05/13/2011 On consideration of the petition for review, it is ORDERED that the Office of the Administrative Hearings shall file the administrative record within 60 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 17. If a hearing was held, the record should include either a certified copy of the transcript of any testimony before the agency or a certified narrative statement of relevant proceedings and evidence in accordance with D.C. App. R. 16 (a)(4). (JAC)
08/16/2011LodgedReceived courtsey copy of letter sent to petitioner' from OAH regarding preparation and cost of transripts
02/17/2012FiledRecord On Appeal
02/17/2012FiledRecord Completed
03/02/2012FiledBriefing Order
04/19/2012FiledOrder directing brief and appendix, accompanied by motion for leave to file out of time.
05/21/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal
05/21/2012FiledDismissed
06/12/2012FiledMandate