judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANDRE J. HAMMOND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 09-CM-1621
Short Caption:ANDRE J. HAMMOND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Misd. Sex Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM135-09Filed Date:09/24/2009

Opening Event Date:09/24/2009Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:08/23/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/30/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAndre J. Hammond Y
Moses CookYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Christian Natiello NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/24/2009NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Moses Cook, Esquire, is hereby assigned to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/30/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #1 (5pgs/Tape) 1/27/09 proc.
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #2 (4pgs/Tape) 3/25/09 proc.
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #3 (27pgs/Tape) 5/5/09 proc.
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #4 (15pgs/Tape) 5/13/09 proc.
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (3pgs/Tape) 6/23/09 proc.
08/23/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #6 (143pgs/White) 8/26/09 w/CD
08/23/2011FiledRecord Completed
08/23/2011FiledRecord Index
08/23/2011FiledRecord Copies
08/24/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (180 Days) (Appellant)Granted
10/18/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to filthe brief and limited appendix until April 2, 2012
11/28/2011FiledReceived this court's order fof 10/18/11 back, "insufficient address" for appellant's counsel. The order has been remailed with the complete address. (Appellant)
04/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief for 30 days (Appellant)Granted
04/23/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before May 14, 2012
05/14/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
05/14/2012FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
06/15/2012FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
06/15/2012FiledTMC//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
11/08/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
11/08/2012FiledAffirmed
11/30/2012FiledMandate