Case Information: 17-CV-1142 | |||
Short Caption: | RECAI ISKENDER V. JOHN CLEVELAND | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - General Civil (CAB) |
Lead: | 17-CV-1142 | Consolidated: | 17-CV-1272 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CAB6074-17 | Filed Date: | 10/05/2017 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 10/05/2017 | Case Status: | Decided/Dismissed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 03/23/2018 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | Recai Iskender | Y | Pro Se | N | |
Appellee | John Cleveland | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
10/05/2017 | Filed | Notice Of Appeal | ||
10/23/2017 | Filed | Motion To Expedite Appeal (Appellant) | Denied | |
11/09/2017 | Discharged | Order To Show Cause and F/O HOLDING IN ABEYANCE appellant's motion to expedite appeal | ||
11/09/2017 | Filed | TMC | ||
12/11/2017 | Filed | ORDER DISCHARGING the 11/9/17 order to show cause and consolidating appeal nos. 17-CV-1142 and 17-CV-1272 and F/O DENYING Appellant's motion to expedite... | ||
01/12/2018 | Filed | Initial Order | ||
02/06/2018 | Filed | Record Index | ||
02/06/2018 | Filed | Record Copies | ||
03/01/2018 | Filed | Order Sua Sponte Dismissing Appeal | ||
03/01/2018 | Filed | Dismissed | ||
03/23/2018 | Filed | Mandate (17-CV-1142) | ||
05/24/2018 | Filed | Received 5/24/18. Order dated 3/1/18 to appellant from USPS stating "not deliverable as addressed." -pmg (Appellant Iskender) |