Case: 14-98-00922-CV
14-98-00922-CV
08/13/1998
Contract
Mort Keshin & Company, Inc.
Houston Chronicle Publishing Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
08/11/2014 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/30/1999 | Case stored | | |
07/08/1999 | Mandate due to be issued | | |
07/08/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/08/1999 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/14/1999 | No Pettition for Review FILED | | |
06/14/1999 | Petition for Review DUE | | |
05/14/1999 | Motion for rehearing DUE | | |
05/14/1999 | No motion for rehearing FILED | | |
04/29/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
04/29/1999 | Opinion issued | AFFIRMED | |
04/28/1999 | Submitted | | |
04/28/1999 | Submission | | |
04/28/1999 | Submitted | | |
11/12/1998 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |
11/12/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
11/02/1998 | Appellee's brief DUE | | |
10/29/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
10/21/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/02/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
10/02/1998 | Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
10/02/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
10/02/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/10/1998 | Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | GRANTED | |
09/03/1998 | Fee of $10 is now due on civil motions FILED. | | |
09/02/1998 | Appellant's brief DUE | | |
09/01/1998 | Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA | | |
08/23/1998 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
08/23/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement DUE | | |
08/20/1998 | Mediation Docketing Statement FILED | | |
08/14/1998 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
08/14/1998 | Court fee due | | |
08/14/1998 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |
08/13/1998 | Clerk's record FILED - APP,STA | | |
08/13/1998 | Record due | | |
08/13/1998 | Reporter's Record Due | | |
08/13/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/04/1998 | Docketing Statement FILED | | |
08/03/1998 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
07/15/1998 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/16/2014 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HOUSTON CHRONICLE PUBLISHING C | Appellee | Suzanne W. Ross James E. Essig |
MORT KESHIN AND COMPANY, INC. | Appellant | Gary F. Cerasuolo |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 1
Harris
Honorable EUGENE CHAMBERS
698,095