judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID J. KOR, JENIFER M. MOYER, f/k/a JENIFER M. KOR, KEVIN A. MOYER AND KAMM, by and through her guardian, JENIFER M. MOYER v. KENNETH KREILING AND VERONICA KREILING, f/k/a VERONICA FLETCHER

Case Heading (S-10-0188)
Case Number:S-10-0188Case Docketed On:09/07/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law
Short Title:DAVID J. KOR, JENIFER M. MOYER, f/k/a JENIFER M. KOR, KEVIN A. MOYER AND KAMM, by and through her guardian, JENIFER M. MOYER v. KENNETH KREILING AND VERONICA KREILING, f/k/a VERONICA FLETCHER
Full Title:DAVID J. KOR, JENIFER M. MOYER, f/k/a JENIFER M. KOR, KEVIN A. MOYER AND KAMM, by and through her guardian, JENIFER M. MOYER, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. KENNETH KREILING AND VERONICA KREILING, f/k/a VERONICA FLETCHER, Appellees (Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid J. KorMargaret M. White
Elizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons
Kathleen M. Karpan
Philip White Jr.
AppellantJenifer M. MoyerMargaret M. White
Elizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons
Kathleen M. Karpan
Philip White Jr.
AppellantKevin A. MoyerMargaret M. White
Elizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons
Kathleen M. Karpan
Philip White Jr.
AppellantK AM MMargaret M. White
Elizabeth Greenwood
Kathleen M. Karpan
Philip White Jr.
AppelleeKenneth KreilingJudith A. W. Studer
AppelleeVeronica KreilingJudith A. W. Studer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Landlord and Tenant, Negligence
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/07/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/07/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/21/2010Event - Other - received email from Phil White regarding the caption of the case.EventOtherFinal
09/27/2010Event - Other - corrected caption to reflect that Ms. Kreiling is "f/k/a Veronica Fletcher" rather than "n/k/a". Sent email notification to counsel.EventOtherFinal
10/11/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/11/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Opening brief of appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Tiem to File Appellees' BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/29/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/01/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Biref of Appellees Kenneth Kreiling and Veronica KreilingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/10/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Margaret M. White for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Judith Studer for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/21/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/21/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/05/2011Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
01/06/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
01/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2011Response/Objection - Other - objection to additional authority.Response/ObjectionOtherFinal
01/13/2011Event - Other - Counsel indicated to court that they have settled this matter and will file a stipulation for dismissal. Oral argument not heard.EventOtherFinal
01/14/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Response to Appellants' Submission of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/31/2011Event - Phone Call - Called counsel for appellants and asked for the status of the motion for dismissal. They are still waiting for settlement paperwork from appellees. Advised counsel for appellant that this case will be set for oral argument next week if we don't receive the paperwork.EventPhone CallFinal
02/04/2011Motion - Other - Stipulated Withdrawal of AppealMotionOtherFinal
02/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Withdrawal of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/04/2011Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/9/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal