judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL J. VAN PATTEN v. CORBY GIPSON, JOHN SHARISKY, and MIKE WIXOM

Case Heading (S-10-0202)
Case Number:S-10-0202Case Docketed On:09/17/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:MICHAEL J. VAN PATTEN v. CORBY GIPSON, JOHN SHARISKY, and MIKE WIXOM
Full Title:MICHAEL J. VAN PATTEN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. CORBY GIPSON, JOHN SHARISKY, and MIKE WIXOM, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael J. Van PattenChristopher M. Brown
Stephen Joseph Darrah
AppelleeCorby GipsonJason A. Neville
Keith J. Dodson
AppelleeJohn ShariskyJason A. Neville
Keith J. Dodson
AppelleeMike WixomJason A. Neville
Keith J. Dodson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Employment Law, Negligence, Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 98
Citation:253 P.3d 505 (Wyo. 20110

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/17/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/17/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/28/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/29/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's principle brief; and received copy of designation of record by appellant.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Brief and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/30/2010Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/10/2011Motion - Strike - Appellant's Reply BriefMotionStrikeFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/11/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; Volume III, Plaintiff's Rule 56.1 Statement.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/24/2011Response/Objection - Motion to Strike Appellant's Reply BriefResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/25/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Response to Appellees' Motion to Strike Reply Brief and copy on cdEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/25/2011Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
01/26/2011Order - Denying Motion to Vacate as MootOrderDenyFinal
01/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' unopposed motion to vacate oral argument settingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/02/2011Order - Other - on Motion to Strike Reply BriefOrderOtherFinal
02/08/2011Event - Phone Call - Contacted counsel for appellant and appellee regarding oral argument. Stephen Joseph Darrah and Keith Dodson will present argument.EventPhone CallFinal
02/11/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Keith Dodson for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - S. Joseph Darrah for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (S. Joseph Darrah for appellant; Keith James Dodson for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/23/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/12/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/12/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/12/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/19/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal