judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ELK RIDGE LODGE, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. GEORGE M. SONNETT, JR. and WENDY Z. BURGERS-SONNETT, husband and wife

Case Heading (S-10-0191)
Case Number:S-10-0191Case Docketed On:09/13/2010
Linked To: S-10-0192
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:ELK RIDGE LODGE, INC., a Wyoming corporation v. GEORGE M. SONNETT, JR. and WENDY Z. BURGERS-SONNETT, husband and wife
Full Title:ELK RIDGE LODGE, INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff/Third-Party Defendant), v. GEORGE M. SONNETT, JR. and WENDY Z. BURGERS-SONNETT, husband and wife, Appellees (Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantElk Ridge Lodge, Inc.Larry B. Jones
William L. Simpson
AppelleeGeorge M. Sonnett Jr.George M. Sonnett Jr.
AppelleeWendy Z. Burgers-Sonnett Pro Se

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2011 WY 106
Citation:254 P.3d 957

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/13/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/13/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Index from district court clerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
11/01/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and Statements of Costs - Rule 10.01, W.R.A.P.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/20/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
01/07/2011Response/Objection - Motion and affidavit.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Response in Opposition to Appellees' Motion to DismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to DismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/19/2011Order - Denying Motion to Dismiss AppealOrderDenyFinal
01/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/21/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/01/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/09/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/09/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/12/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal