judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF ROBERT LEE McNEEL: EVA D. KELLY, an individual v. ROBY LEE McNEEL, Guardian and Conservator and Trustee of the Robert L. McNeel Living Trust

Case Heading (S-10-0190)
Case Number:S-10-0190Case Docketed On:09/09/2010
Linked To: S-10-0179
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Guardian and Ward (Title 3)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF ROBERT LEE McNEEL: EVA D. KELLY, an individual v. ROBY LEE McNEEL, Guardian and Conservator and Trustee of the Robert L. McNeel Living Trust
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE GUARDIANSHIP AND CONSERVATORSHIP OF ROBERT LEE McNEEL: EVA D. KELLY, an individual, Appellant (Guardian) v. ROBY LEE McNEEL, Guardian and Conservator and Trustee of the Robert L. McNeel Living Trust, Appellee (Intervenor).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantEva D. KellyChris Dull Edwards
AppelleeRoby L. McNeelHenry F. Bailey Jr.
Lance T. Harmon

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates - Wills, Guardianship, Property
Opinion Number:2011 WY 79
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/09/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court (District Court Clerk delayed notification due to Counsel's indication that a Statement of Evidence would be prepared -- no filed.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/09/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/17/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
09/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' unopposed motion for joinder/consolidation with Wyoming Supreme Court cases S-10-0179 and S-10-0180; and received proposed orderEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/20/2010Order - Consolidating cases and granting extension of time to file briefs (Appellants'/Appellant's Brief in S-10-0179 & S-10-0190 due 10/27/10, Appellant's Brief in Case S-10-0180 also due 10/27/10)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/04/2010Notice-Incoming - Index from district court clerkNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
10/27/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
11/01/2010Event - Phone Call - Ms. Edwards called and indicated that the hard copies of the brief were mailed on Wednesday, 10/27/10.EventPhone CallFinal
11/02/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant, Statement of Costs, and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/08/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees, Roby L. McNeel, individually, and as guardian and conservator or Robert Lee McNeel.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/09/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by counsel for AppelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Henry F. Bailey, Jr. for appellee McNeel.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/14/2011Event - Phone Call - from District Court Clerk, record will be delayed, some trial exhibits are missing.EventPhone CallFinal
01/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volumes IV-V, Transcripts; Volumes VI-VIII, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Chris Dull Edwards for appellantsNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/16/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Chriss Dull Edwards for appellants; Henry F. Bailey, Jr. and Lance T. Harmon, argument by Mr. Bailey for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/09/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2011Service - Other - UPS tracking summary. Record signed for 5/31/2011.ServiceOtherFinal