judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCUS C. SILVER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0580
Short Caption:MARCUS C. SILVER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-4345-10Filed Date:05/09/2011

Opening Event Date:05/09/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:09/12/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/17/2013
Argued/Submitted:05/28/2014
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/13/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcus C. Silver Y
Jonathan P. Willmott YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/09/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/31/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
06/16/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #1 (86 pgs/Drury) 2/1/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #2 (258 pgs/Drury) 2/7/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #3 (244 pgs/Davis) 2/8/11 proc
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #4 (245 pgs/Drury) 2/9/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #5 (192 pgs/Davis) 2/10/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #6 (259 pgs/Drury) 2/14/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #7 (184 pgs/Davis) 2/15/11 proc.
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #8 (20 pgs/Drury) 2/16-17/11 proc
08/31/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #9 (22 pgs/Maar) 4/22/11 proc.
09/12/2011FiledRecord Copies
09/12/2011FiledRecord Index
09/12/2011FiledSupplemental Record specify - #10 (SEALED pleading)
09/12/2011FiledRecord Completed
10/03/2011FiledBriefing Order
11/04/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
11/16/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix to 2/13/12.
02/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellant)Granted
02/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension fo time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 5/14/12.
05/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
05/18/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 8/13/12
08/03/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/13/12
09/14/2012FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
10/05/2012FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw James W. Klein(Appellant) and appoint Cynthia Works, Esquire
12/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
01/11/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 4/8/13
04/05/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
04/11/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 5/8/13
05/08/2013FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
05/15/2013FiledOrder Granting Counsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant) and appointment of Cynthia Goode Works, Esquire, is vacated and Jonathan P. Willmott, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant. Brief and limited appendix of appellant due w/n 90 days of order.
08/13/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/19/2013FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (12 pgs/tape) 11/23/10 proc.
08/19/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant) to 11/12/13
11/12/2013FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/12/2013FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/17/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/17/2013FiledBriefing Completed
01/14/2014FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
02/11/2014FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
03/27/2014FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/28/2014FiledArgued before Associate Judge Glickman, Associate Judge Blackburne-Rigsby, and Senior Judge Nebeker. (Jonathan P. Willmott, Esq. for appellant) (Kristina L. Ament, Esq. for appellee)
07/22/2014FiledAffirmed In Part/Reversed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges; and Nebeker, Senior Judge)
08/13/2014FiledMandate
07/19/2016FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
07/19/2016FiledAppendix to motion to recall mandate (Appellant)
07/20/2016FiledTMC (Motion to Recall Mandate)
12/20/2016FiledOrder Denying motion to recall mandate
12/30/2016FiledMotion To Reconsider denial of petition to recall the mandate (Appellant)Denied
03/07/2017FiledOrder Denying motion for reconsideration