Case: 05-98-01311-CR
05-98-01311-CR
08/12/1998
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lawton, Jason
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/07/2001 | Record Returned | | |
10/02/2001 | Record Shipped | | |
06/13/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
06/13/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/11/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/11/2000 | Record Retention | Retain | |
04/11/2000 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/10/2000 | Submission | | |
04/10/2000 | Submitted | | |
01/12/2000 | Submitted | | |
11/10/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
11/09/1999 | Letter Filed | | |
11/01/1999 | Submission | | |
06/14/1999 | Motion to File Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
06/08/1999 | Motion for Leave to File | | |
05/06/1999 | Brief Due | | |
05/06/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
05/06/1999 | Case ready to be set | | |
04/06/1999 | Brief Filed | | |
04/06/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/05/1999 | Brief Received | | |
04/05/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
03/25/1999 | Notice To Appellant that Brief is late | | |
03/01/1999 | Brief Due | | |
01/12/1999 | Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/11/1999 | Mot. for Ext. to File Brief | | |
01/08/1999 | Brief Due | | |
12/19/1998 | Court Reporter Record Due | | |
12/09/1998 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
11/26/1998 | Record due | | |
11/25/1998 | Extension on Reporter's Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/24/1998 | Extension on Reporter's Record | | |
11/04/1998 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
08/13/1998 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
08/12/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
08/12/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/29/1998 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
07/29/1998 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
07/23/1998 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/13/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Joe Phillips | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Joseph Phillips |
Jason Lawton | Criminal - Appellant | Allan Fishburn Jason Matthew Lawton |
The State Of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | D. Prichard Bevis, Jr. |
Judge | Judge - Trial Court | Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court |
Clerk | Trial court clerk | Dallas District Clerk, 282nd District Court |
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Karen J. Greene
F97-32199-JS
20yrs.