judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS (ROY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34641
Short Caption:THOMAS (ROY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157319Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/09/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/09/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07307
09/08/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08427
09/08/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08428
09/23/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09062
10/13/1999Order/Procedural Order. Court reporter Tina Smith shall deliver copies of the requested transcripts to the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with NRAP 3C (d)(3)(iii). 99-09897
10/21/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 17, 1999; July 6, 1999. Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 99-10296
04/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." - SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 00-05866
05/09/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-07600
05/09/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/26/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 11, 2000. 00-07600