judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LESLIE L. YOTHER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-07-0041)
Case Number:S-07-0041Case Docketed On:02/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:LESLIE L. YOTHER v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:LESLIE L. YOTHER, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLeslie L. YotherDavid M. Gosar
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Steven R. Czoschke
Kristi Marie Radosevich

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 192
Citation:173 P.3d 356 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/06/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
05/21/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on diskBriefAppelleeFinal
05/24/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/11/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/20/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
12/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversing and remanding. Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/21/2007Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
01/08/2008Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/08/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/08/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/14/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 1/10/08 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal