judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CONYERS, MICHAEL E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-1235
Short Caption:CONYERS, MICHAEL E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5246-79Filed Date:10/02/1980

Opening Event Date:10/02/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/15/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/17/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CONYERS, MICHAEL E. UNITED STATES
10/02/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/15/1981FiledRecord Completed
01/17/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/15/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition