judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GEORGE M. SONNETT, JR. and WENDY Z. BURGERS-SONNETT v. DANIEL FOX and TERRY REACH, as individuals d/b/a ELK RIDGE LODGE, INC.; and ELK RIDGE LODGE INC., a Wyoming corporation

Case Heading (S-10-0192)
Case Number:S-10-0192Case Docketed On:09/13/2010
Linked To: S-10-0191
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:GEORGE M. SONNETT, JR. and WENDY Z. BURGERS-SONNETT v. DANIEL FOX and TERRY REACH, as individuals d/b/a ELK RIDGE LODGE, INC.; and ELK RIDGE LODGE INC., a Wyoming corporation
Full Title:GEORGE M. SONNETT, JR. and WENDY Z. BURGERS-SONNETT, Appellants (Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs), v. DANIEL FOX and TERRY REACH, as individuals d/b/a ELK RIDGE LODGE, INC.; and ELK RIDGE LODGE INC., a Wyoming corporation, Appellees (Third-Party Defendants)

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGeorge M. Sonnett Jr.George M. Sonnett Jr.
AppellantWendy Z. Burgers-Sonnett Pro Se
AppelleeDaniel FoxLarry B. Jones
William L. Simpson
AppelleeTerry ReachLarry B. Jones
William L. Simpson
AppelleeElk Ridge Lodge, Inc.Larry B. Jones
William L. Simpson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Contracts, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2011 WY 106
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/13/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/13/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/01/2010Event - Phone Call to Appellants, left message that the hard copies had been received, but the brief has to be e-filed for a timely filing. Also sent e-mail to address on brief.EventPhone CallFinal
11/01/2010Event - Phone Call from Appellant, will accept papers copiesEventPhone CallFinal
11/01/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/03/2010Brief - Other copy of brief on cdBriefOtherFinal
12/16/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/20/2010Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
01/03/2011Event - Phone Call. Received call from Ms. Sonnett indicating that they could not access the internet, their service was down, and the public service did not have access either. Advised to keep trying, and if not able to file, could request permission to file late.EventPhone CallFinal
01/03/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/21/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/21/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/21/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/01/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/25/2011Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
07/29/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/09/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/09/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/09/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/12/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal