judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FREDRIC VINCENT SACCATO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0198)
Case Number:S-10-0198Case Docketed On:09/16/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:FREDRIC VINCENT SACCATO v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:FREDRIC VINCENT SACCATO, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantFredric Vincent Saccato Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law
Opinion Number:2011 WY 15
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/02/2010Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/03/2010Correspondence - Incoming - copy of letter to Appellate counselCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/17/2010Brief - AndersBriefAndersFinal
11/17/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/17/2010Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
11/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file pro se brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/17/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to withdraw as counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/07/2010Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdrawOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
01/19/2011Event - Phone Call - received call from Attorney General's office indicating that appellant sent eight copies of brief to their office. They will forward the original plus six to the court.EventPhone CallFinal
01/20/2011Brief - Anders (Date on Certificate of Service left blank).BriefAndersFinal
02/03/2011Order - Other - Order Affirming Judgment and Sentence of the District CourtOrderOtherFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/22/2011Record - Returned unfiled recordRecordReturned unfiled recordFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/22/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/24/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal