judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEROME BOWMAN V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 11-CT-0586
Short Caption:JEROME BOWMAN V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Lead:11-CT-0586Consolidated: 12-CT-0097
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF-13336-08Filed Date:05/12/2011

Opening Event Date:05/12/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:06/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/15/2013
Argued/Submitted:11/12/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/02/2014

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
Janice Y. SheppardYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/12/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
06/01/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that David Woll, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
06/01/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) David Woll, Esquire
06/09/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
06/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (55pgs/Tape) 6/23/10 proc. w/CD
06/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
06/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/20/2011RECORD INDEX
06/20/2011RECORD COPIES
07/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File - until September 27, 2011 Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
08/10/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until September 27, 2011
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File (titled as motion for stay of briefing schedule) Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Denied as Moot
10/24/2011FiledOrdered that the appellant's motion for stay is hereby held in abeyance and directing status of the motion on or before December 23, 2011
12/19/2011FiledStatus Statement (Appellant)
01/05/2012LodgedReceived a courtsey copy of order from superior court dated 12/5/11 (Appellant) signed by J. Frederick J. Sullivan
01/31/2012FiledOrder Denying appellant's motion to stay as moot and directing briefing
01/31/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/08/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until June 11, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
03/15/2012FiledOrder Sua Sponte Consolidating Appeals 11-CT-586 and 12-CT-97 for all purposes, appointing counsel in 12-CT-97, granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief in appeal no. 11-CT-586 and directing briefing
03/15/2012FiledAppointing Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to January 30, 2012 for 12-ct-97 David Carey Woll, Esquire
03/15/2012FiledBriefing Order
03/19/2012FiledRecord Copies (12-CT-97)
03/19/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CT-97)
05/31/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until July 10, 2012 (Appellant)Granted
06/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix on or before July 10, 2012
06/21/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/21/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/02/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
08/17/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before November 23, 2012
11/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
12/31/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an exetnsion of time to file the brief on or before Februay 14, 2013
02/14/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until February 28,2013 (Appellee)
02/27/2013FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Denied
03/04/2013FiledTMC//MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING//MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/15/2013FiledOrder Granting motion for extension of time to file motion for summary affirmance
04/15/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte filing appellee'as motion for summary affirmance as its brief
04/15/2013FiledBrief (Appellee)
04/15/2013FiledBriefing Completed
09/11/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Summary
09/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/12/2013FiledSubmitted To Associate Judge McLeese, Senior Judge Ferren, and Senior Judge Newman.
12/11/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (McLeese, Associate Judge; and Newman and Ferren, Senior Judges)
12/27/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
01/02/2014FiledMandate