judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

AUTO CONVOY COMPANY, ET AL. v. RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, JEAN EDDY

Case: B-4241
B-4241
09/26/1973
MISC PETITION
AUTO CONVOY COMPANY, ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, JEAN EDDY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/19/1973Appellees' Brief filed
11/19/1973Appellees' Brief filed
10/26/1973Appellant's Brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/03/1974Opinion issued
11/19/1973Appellees' Brief filed
11/19/1973Appellees' Brief filed
10/26/1973Appellant's Brief filed
10/05/1973Statement of Jurisidiction
09/26/1973Document received (See Remarks)
09/26/1973Document received (See Remarks)
09/26/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jean EddyAppellee
Railroad Commission of TexasAppellee
Auto Convoy Company, et al.Appellant
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information