judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY, a Nevada corporation v. THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER & SEWER DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-10-0199)
Case Number:S-10-0199Case Docketed On:09/16/2010
Linked To: S-10-0238
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY, a Nevada corporation v. THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER & SEWER DISTRICT
Full Title:MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY, a Nevada corporation, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER & SEWER DISTRICT, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMountain Cement CompanyPhilip A. Nicholas
Mitchell H. Edwards
AppelleeThe South of Laramie Water & Sewer DistrictKermit C. Brown
Elisa Michelle Butler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Elections, Taxation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 81
Citation:255 P.3d 881

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/16/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/16/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/16/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/01/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/03/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/20/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee - The South of Laramie Water and Sewer DistrictEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2010Notice-Internal - Other - Consolidated with S-10-0238, per 11/16/2010 order, for oral argument (if any) and decisionNotice-InternalOtherFinal
01/03/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kermit C. Brown for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mitchell Edwards for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/09/2011Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Edwards indicating that Phil Nicholas will present argument on behalf of appellant.EventPhone CallFinal
03/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/14/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mitchell H. Edwards and Philip A. Nicholas, argument by Mr. Nicholas for appellant; Kermit C. Brown and Elisa M. Butler, argument by Mr. Brown for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal