judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

REED (DESHAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35003
Short Caption:REED (DESHAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C159282Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-10276
11/22/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Order to Show Cause. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person. It appears that appellant was represented by Bret Whipple during the lower court proceedings. Bret Whipple shall have 20 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. 99-11635
12/14/1999MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. 99-12592
01/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. On December 14, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-01254
01/26/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.