judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARBARA L. MAGIN, as a trustee of the Barbara L. Magin trust u/t/a dated June 30, 1995 v. SOLITUDE HOMEOWNER'S, INC., a Wyoming non-profit corporation

Case Heading (S-10-0177)
Parent: S-10-0166 Case Docketed On:08/13/2010
Consolidated:S-10-0177
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:BARBARA L. MAGIN, as a trustee of the Barbara L. Magin trust u/t/a dated June 30, 1995 v. SOLITUDE HOMEOWNER'S, INC., a Wyoming non-profit corporation
Full Title:BARBARA L. MAGIN, as a trustee of the Barbara L. Magin trust u/t/a dated June 30, 1995, Appellant (Defendant), v. SOLITUDE HOMEOWNER'S, INC., a Wyoming non-profit corporation, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBarbara L. MaginGerard R. Bosch
Mark Jonathan Longfield
AppelleeSolitude Homeowner's Inc., a Wyoming non-profit corporationGlenn Martin Ford

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Attorney Fees, Civil Procedure, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2011 WY 102
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/13/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/13/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/13/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/13/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/26/2010Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
08/27/2010Event - Hardcopy received - of motion to consolidate.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/30/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Consolidate Appeals (Appellant requests briefing extension without formal motion to Court.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2010Event - Phone Call re due date of consolidated briefingEventPhone CallFinal
09/03/2010Notice-Incoming - Errata to Motion to ConsolidateNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
09/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of ErrataEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2010Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/01/2010Event - Rejected Filing - brief of appellant was untimely.EventRejected FilingFinal
10/01/2010Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
10/05/2010Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
10/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's petition to reinstate appeal; Affidavit of Gerard R. Bosch; Proposed Order; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/26/2010Order - Granting Petition to Reinstate AppealOrderGrantFinal
11/03/2010Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
11/05/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/21/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Reply Brief and copy on diskEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/27/2010Service - Certificate of service, attached to brief of AppelleeServiceCertificate of serviceFinal
01/11/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/20/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts and Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/20/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/21/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Gerard R. Bosh for appellant Magin.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/08/2011Event - Phone Call. Contacted counsel for appellee regarding presentation of oral argument. Mr. Ford will attend.EventPhone CallFinal
02/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Gerard R. Bosch for appellant; Glenn Martin Ford for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/30/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Chief Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/18/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal