judyrecords
search tips
660 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD A. HARVEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Case Heading (S-10-0194)
Case Number:S-10-0194Case Docketed On:09/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Motor Vehicles (Title 31)
Short Title:RONALD A. HARVEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Full Title:RONALD A. HARVEY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald A. HarveyR. Michael Vang
AppelleeDepartment of TransportationBruce A. Salzburg
Robin Sessions Cooley
Douglas J. Moench
Kenneth J. Miller

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -DUI, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2011 WY 72
Citation:250 P.3d 167

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/14/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/28/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/28/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Ronald HarveyEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/15/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, State of Wyoming, Department of TransportationEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2010Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/04/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/06/2011Event - Phone Call - received call from district court clerk indicating that she is awaiting the return of the agency record from counsel so that she can forward the transmitted record on appeal.EventPhone CallFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/10/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/25/2011Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/25/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/11/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/11/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/17/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 5/16/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal