judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ANTOINE JAMES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 11-CF-0581
Short Caption:ANTOINE JAMES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-12421-10Filed Date:05/11/2011

Opening Event Date:05/11/2011Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:07/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAntoine James Y
Paul J. RileyYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
05/11/2011NOTICE OF APPEAL
05/31/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Paul J. Riley, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
05/31/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Paul J. Riley, Esquire
06/30/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
07/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (80 pgs/tape) 4/12/11 proc.
07/07/2011RECORD INDEX
07/07/2011RECORD COPIES
07/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
07/12/2011FiledIt appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 60 days (Appellant)
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and limited appendix to 10/21/11.
10/17/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until December 20, 2011 (Appellant)Denied as Moot
12/19/2011LodgedBrief (MAXB still pend). (Appellant)
01/05/2012FiledORDER THAT APPELLANT SHALL NO LATER THAN JANUARY 30, 2012, FILE ANY RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
01/05/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
05/22/2012FiledORDER GRANTING COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW (ANDERS)
05/22/2012FiledAffirmed
06/13/2012FiledMandate