judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIGUEL VALVERDE-GARCIA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0193)
Case Number:S-10-0193Case Docketed On:09/14/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MIGUEL VALVERDE-GARCIA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MIGUEL VALVERDE-GARCIA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMiguel Valverde-GarciaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/14/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/28/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/01/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/02/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/15/2010Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
11/15/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; waiver of appeal; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/16/2010Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/16/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal